TN SJR0813 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for recess from close of business on January 11, 2024, until January 17, 2024, in observance of Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. Day.
Title
A RESOLUTION to provide for a recess in the proceedings of the One Hundred Thirteenth General Assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-01-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-01-11 | House | R/S Concurred, v.v. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0813&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/SJR0813.pdf |