TN SJR0881 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Failed for lack of motion in: Delayed Bill Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Failed for lack of motion in: Delayed Bill Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the University of Tennessee and the University of Memphis football teams to play annually and the University of Tennessee and University of Memphis men's basketball teams to play at least once annually.
Title
Urges the University of Tennessee and the University of Memphis football teams to play annually and the University of Tennessee and University of Memphis men's basketball teams to play at least once annually.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | Failed for lack of motion in: Delayed Bill Committee |
2020-05-29 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 6/1/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Comm. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/9/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |