TN SR0032 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Signed by S. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Signed by S. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the Tennessee Surpreme Court not to adopt the proposed amendment to Rule 8, Rules of Professional Conduct 8.4, of the Rules of the Tennessee Supreme Court relative to professional misconduct by attorneys
Title
Urges the Tennessee Surpreme Court not to adopt the proposed amendment to Rule 8, Rules of Professional Conduct 8.4, of the Rules of the Tennessee Supreme Court relative to professional misconduct by attorneys
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/8/2013 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud. Comm. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Filed for intro. |