TN SR0140 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Encourages Rutherford County Schools to develop a partnership with the Girl Scouts of Middle Tennessee to permit the use of school facilities at a reduced fee or at no cost.
Title
Encourages Rutherford County Schools to develop a partnership with the Girl Scouts of Middle Tennessee to permit the use of school facilities at a reduced fee or at no cost.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SR0140&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/SR0140.pdf |