TX HB1008 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-25 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-25 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to an exemption from ad valorem taxation of the residence homesteads of certain totally disabled veterans.
Title
Relating to an exemption from ad valorem taxation of the residence homesteads of certain totally disabled veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-25 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-02-03 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB192 (Same As) 2009-02-10 - Referred to Finance
HB62 (Same As) 2009-03-25 - Left pending in committee
HB62 (Same As) 2009-03-25 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions