TX HB102 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the offense of cargo theft.
Title
Relating to the creation of the offense of cargo theft.
Sponsors
Rep. Allen Fletcher [R] | Rep. Rodney Anderson [R] | Rep. Cindy Burkett [R] | Rep. Yvonne Davis [D] |
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - SUSPEND ALL NECESSARY RULES (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2015-05-08 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2015-05-08 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-08 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-06 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-06 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-04 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-04 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-01 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Property
Transportation
Transportation--Aviation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Transportation--Railroads
Crimes--Against Property
Transportation
Transportation--Aviation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Transportation--Railroads