TX HB1070 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . December 1, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the mental health first aid training program reporting requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the mental health first aid training program reporting requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1711 (Y: 135 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#364 (Y: 139 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Read 2nd time RV#340 (Y: 132 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . December 1, 2019
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-22SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-22HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1711
2019-05-22HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-16HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-16HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-16HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-16SenateRecord vote
2019-05-16SenatePassed
2019-05-16SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-16SenateRecord vote
2019-05-16SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-16SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-13SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-17SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-04-17SenateRead first time
2019-04-16SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#364
2019-04-16HousePassed
2019-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#340
2019-04-15HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-15HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-21HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-26HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-02-26HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1070
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01070I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01070H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01070S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01070F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1070&RcdVtNo=340&Ch=H&Dt=04/15/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1070&RcdVtNo=364&Ch=H&Dt=04/16/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-16-F.PDF#page=12
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1070&RcdVtNo=1711&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2019

Bill Comments

feedback