TX HB1115 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to law enforcement agency policies regarding the placement of a child taken into possession by a peace officer during a person's arrest and placement information provided to the person.
Title
Relating to law enforcement agency policies regarding the placement of a child taken into possession by a peace officer during a person's arrest and placement information provided to the person.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
SHERIFFS
Criminal Procedure--General
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
SHERIFFS