TX HB121 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to standing for certain individuals to file a suit affecting the parent-child relationship.
Title
Relating to standing for certain individuals to file a suit affecting the parent-child relationship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Postponed | |
2011-05-12 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-12 | Record vote | |
2011-05-12 | Amended | |
2011-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-09 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-11 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2011-02-11 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed |