TX HB1214 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
Summary
Relating to meetings of the coastal coordination council.
Title
Relating to meetings of the coastal coordination council.
Sponsors
Rep. Tara Ybarra [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-03-30 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-03-27 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-25 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-03-25 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-18 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-18 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time | |
2009-02-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB803 (Similar To) 2009-05-12 - Effective on 9/1/09