TX HB1222 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the annual salaries of the chief justice or the presiding judge of an appellate court.
Title
Relating to the annual salaries of the chief justice or the presiding judge of an appellate court.
Sponsors
Rep. John Wray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1222 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01222I.htm |