TX HB1278 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on February 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to the proof of identity and residency required of an applicant for a driver's license or personal identification certificate.
Title
Relating to the proof of identity and residency required of an applicant for a driver's license or personal identification certificate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-01 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-01 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2009-05-01 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-01 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-01 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-16 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-16 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-16 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Public Safety | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time | |
2009-02-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2261 (Same As) 2009-03-31 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
Subjects
IDENTIFICATION CARDS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses