TX HB1280 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to who may request a public hearing from the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality related to the construction of a concrete plant.
Title
Relating to who may request a public hearing from the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality related to the construction of a concrete plant.
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1310 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
SB1247 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
SB1247 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1280 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01280I.htm |