TX HB1287 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the contents of an application by certain persons for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of the person's residence homestead.
Title
Relating to the contents of an application by certain persons for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of the person's residence homestead.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - House - HB 1287Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in subcommittee |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-18 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-18 | House | Passed |
2013-04-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-18 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-03-25 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-03-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-03-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-03-18 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Aging
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions