TX HB13 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to flood planning, mitigation, and infrastructure projects; making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to flood planning, mitigation, and infrastructure projects; making an appropriation.

Sponsors

Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]
Rep. John Zerwas [R]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]
Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Michelle Beckley [D]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. John Bucy [D]
Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]
Rep. Gina Calanni [D]Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]
Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Sarah Davis [R]
Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. Harold Dutton [D]
Rep. Jessica Farrar [D]Rep. Art Fierro [D]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]
Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Roland Gutierrez [D]Rep. Sam Harless [R]
Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]
Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]
Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]Rep. Julie Johnson [D]
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]
Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]
Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]
Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]
Rep. Terry Meza [D]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]
Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Christina Morales [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]
Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D]
Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]
Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]
Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]Rep. John Raney [R]
Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]
Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]
Rep. Carl Sherman [D]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. James Talarico [D]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]
Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Chris Turner [D]
Rep. John Turner [D]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Hubert Vo [D]Rep. Armando Walle [D]
Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]
Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]Sen. Charles Creighton [R]Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D]

Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#278 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateNo action taken in committee
2019-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-16SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-15SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-04-16SenateReferred to Water & Rural Affairs
2019-04-16SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-11HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-11HouseSubject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
2019-04-11HouseRecord vote RV#278
2019-04-11HousePassed
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-10HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2019-04-10HouseAmended 2-Phelan
2019-04-10HouseAmended 1-Phelan
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-18HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HJR4 (Enabling for) 2019-05-28 - Filed with the Secretary of State
HJR81 (Enabling for) 2019-03-05 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback