TX HB1300 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to cultivated oyster mariculture; authorizing fees; requiring a permit; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to cultivated oyster mariculture; authorizing fees; requiring a permit; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#190 (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-24 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-13HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-10HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-10HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenatePassed
2019-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-10SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-10SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-30SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-30SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-29SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-04-17SenateReferred to Water & Rural Affairs
2019-04-17SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-09HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-09HouseRecord vote RV#190
2019-04-09HousePassed
2019-04-09HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-08HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-08HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB682 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Agriculture

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback