TX HB14 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Texas Electricity Supply Chain Security and Mapping Committee.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Texas Electricity Supply Chain Security and Mapping Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#324 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-20 | House | Record vote RV#324 |
2021-04-20 | House | Passed |
2021-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-19 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-19 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-01 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Energy Resources |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
ELECTRICITY SUPPLY CHAIN SECURITY & MAPPING COMMITTEE, TEXAS
Electronic Information Systems
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT, TEXAS DIVISION OF
Energy
Energy--General
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--Natural Gas
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
ELECTRICITY SUPPLY CHAIN SECURITY & MAPPING COMMITTEE, TEXAS
Electronic Information Systems
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT, TEXAS DIVISION OF
Energy
Energy--General
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--Natural Gas