TX HB1417 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sale of fireworks during and before the Diwali holiday.
Title
Relating to the sale of fireworks during and before the Diwali holiday.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2017-02-28 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
County Government
County Government--General
Holidays
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Safety
Safety--Fireworks
TEXAS A&M FOREST SERVICE
County Government
County Government--General
Holidays
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Safety
Safety--Fireworks
TEXAS A&M FOREST SERVICE