TX HB1461 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reimbursement of excess costs incurred by a recipient of certain grants awarded by the Texas Department of Transportation.
Title
Relating to the reimbursement of excess costs incurred by a recipient of certain grants awarded by the Texas Department of Transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2023-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Financial
Financial--General
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Financial--General
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous