TX HB1480 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to assessment of public school students, providing accelerated instruction, appropriately crediting certain student performance, and eliminating requirements based on performance on certain assessment instruments.
Title
Relating to assessment of public school students, providing accelerated instruction, appropriately crediting certain student performance, and eliminating requirements based on performance on certain assessment instruments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#326 (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - RV#315 (Y: 134 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - RV#315 (Y: 134 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-12 | House | Record vote RV#326 |
2019-04-12 | House | Passed |
2019-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | House | Record vote RV#315 |
2019-04-11 | House | Amended 1-Ashby |
2019-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--School Districts
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--School Districts