TX HB1634 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the imposition, rate, and use of revenue derived from certain local hotel occupancy taxes; authorizing the imposition of a tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the imposition, rate, and use of revenue derived from certain local hotel occupancy taxes; authorizing the imposition of a tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1945 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective immediately
2019-06-14 Filed without the Governor's signature
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-26SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-26SenateHouse discharges conferees-reported
2019-05-26HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1945
2019-05-26HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-26HouseHouse discharges conferees
2019-05-24SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-24SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-24SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-24HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-24HouseHouse requests conference committee
2019-05-24HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateAmended
2019-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Taylor
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateAmended
2019-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Campbell
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-22SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-16SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-16SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2019-05-07SenateRead first time
2019-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#962
2019-05-03HousePassed
2019-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-03HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-23HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-17HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1634
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01634I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01634H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01634E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01634S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01634F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1634&RcdVtNo=962&Ch=H&Dt=05/03/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=30
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=31
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1634&RcdVtNo=1945&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2019

Bill Comments

feedback