TX HB1700 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public information in the possession, custody, or control of a current or former officer or employee of a governmental body; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to public information in the possession, custody, or control of a current or former officer or employee of a governmental body; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Hunter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Open Records
State Officers
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Open Records
State Officers
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1700 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01700I.htm |