TX HB1785 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the designation of the structure on State Highway 6 in Eastland County adjacent to Lake Cisco connecting the north and south banks of Sandy Creek as the Bedford-Carmichael Bridge.
Title
Relating to the designation of the structure on State Highway 6 in Eastland County adjacent to Lake Cisco connecting the north and south banks of Sandy Creek as the Bedford-Carmichael Bridge.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Lang [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2017-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1785 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01785I.htm |