TX HB1794 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to suits brought by local governments for violations of certain laws under the jurisdiction of, or rules adopted or orders or permits issued by, the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality; affecting civil penalties.
Title
Relating to suits brought by local governments for violations of certain laws under the jurisdiction of, or rules adopted or orders or permits issued by, the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality; affecting civil penalties.
Sponsors
Rep. Charlie Geren [R] | Rep. Patricia Harless [R] | Rep. Cindy Burkett [R] | Rep. Oscar Longoria [D] |
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] | Sen. Kelly Hancock [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-22 - House - HB 1794Third Reading House (Y: 116 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - HB 1794Third Reading House (Y: 96 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 2 by Rodriguez, Eddie (Y: 81 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - HB 1794Third Reading House (Y: 96 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 2 by Rodriguez, Eddie (Y: 81 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-22 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-22 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-28 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed |
2015-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-27 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-27 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-27 | House | Amendment tabled |
2015-04-27 | House | Amended |
2015-04-27 | House | Point of order overruled |
2015-04-27 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-04-27 | House | Postponed |
2015-04-27 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2015-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-31 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2015-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Environment
Environment--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
STATUTES OF LIMITATIONS
Environment
Environment--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
STATUTES OF LIMITATIONS