TX HB1880 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to health benefit plan provider networks; providing an administrative penalty; authorizing an assessment.
Title
Relating to health benefit plan provider networks; providing an administrative penalty; authorizing an assessment.
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1287 (Y: 116 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1287 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1188 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Insurers & Agents