TX HB1887 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Pensions, Investments & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Pensions, Investments & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the evaluation and reporting of investment practices and performance of certain public retirement systems.
Title
Relating to the evaluation and reporting of investment practices and performance of certain public retirement systems.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB322 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Subjects
INTERNET
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
Retirement Systems--Municipal
Retirement Systems--Teachers
STATE PENSION REVIEW BOARD
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
Retirement Systems--Municipal
Retirement Systems--Teachers
STATE PENSION REVIEW BOARD
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1887 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01887I.htm |