TX HB1917 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-15)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-15)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to contract requirements for prescription drug benefits provided by Medicaid managed care organizations.
Title
Relating to contract requirements for prescription drug benefits provided by Medicaid managed care organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#768 (Y: 102 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Point of order withdrawn RV#699 (Y: 113 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#768 (Y: 102 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Point of order withdrawn RV#699 (Y: 113 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-22 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Rereferred to committee |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-03 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2017-05-03 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-03 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-03 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-15 | House | Filed |