TX HB1968 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to regulation of gas pipelines; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to regulation of gas pipelines; providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-23 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Energy Resources | |
2011-03-07 | Read first time | |
2011-03-01 | Filed |
Subjects
ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, STATE OFFICE OF
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
GAS PIPELINE REGULATORY ACT
PUBLIC UTILITY COUNSEL, OFFICE OF
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Natural Gas
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
GAS PIPELINE REGULATORY ACT
PUBLIC UTILITY COUNSEL, OFFICE OF
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Natural Gas
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB1968 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB01968I.htm |