TX HB2006 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to locations, terms, sessions, and procedures for conducting court proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to locations, terms, sessions, and procedures for conducting court proceedings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-05HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-03-05HouseRead first time
2019-02-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB40 (Same As) 2019-06-07 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback