TX HB2075 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain diseases or illnesses suffered by firefighters and emergency medical technicians.
Title
Relating to certain diseases or illnesses suffered by firefighters and emergency medical technicians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-04 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-02 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-02 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-27 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-04-27 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-18 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2011-04-18 | Correction in referral | |
2011-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | |
2011-04-15 | Subcommittee members named | |
2011-04-15 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | |
2011-03-08 | Read first time | |
2011-03-02 | Filed |
Subjects
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--AIDS
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
HEPATITIS
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--AIDS
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
HEPATITIS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB2075 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB02075I.htm |