TX HB2102 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the payment of insurance deductibles related to property insurance policies; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the payment of insurance deductibles related to property insurance policies; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1924 (Y: 82 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - Motion fails RV#1854 (Y: 64 N: 75 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1924
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseVote reconsidered
2019-05-24House1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1854
2019-05-24HouseMotion fails
2019-05-24HouseMotion to concur in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-14SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-06SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-05-06SenateRead first time
2019-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#962
2019-05-03HousePassed
2019-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-03HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-25HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-16HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1169 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2102
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02102I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02102H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02102E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02102S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02102F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2102&RcdVtNo=962&Ch=H&Dt=05/03/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2102&RcdVtNo=1854&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2102&RcdVtNo=1924&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=169

Bill Comments

feedback