TX HB2301 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operation of personal delivery and mobile carrying devices.
Title
Relating to the operation of personal delivery and mobile carrying devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB969 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Roads
County Government
County Government--Roads
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
City Government--Roads
County Government
County Government--Roads
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road