TX HB2315 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a county's general revenue levy for indigent health care.
Title
Relating to a county's general revenue levy for indigent health care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-25 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-20 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2011-04-29 | Read first time | |
2011-04-26 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-25 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-21 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-21 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-21 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-14 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-13 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-13 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-12 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-12 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2011-03-10 | Read first time | |
2011-03-04 | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Finance
County Government--General
Health
Health--Indigent Health Care
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
County Government--Finance
County Government--General
Health
Health--Indigent Health Care
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous