TX HB2325 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to emergency generators or other power sources in nursing facilities and assisted living facilities.
Title
Relating to emergency generators or other power sources in nursing facilities and assisted living facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1614 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Co-author authorized
SB1614 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Co-author authorized
SB1614 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
ASSISTED LIVING FACILITIES
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Nursing Homes
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Nursing Homes