TX HB233 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to inservice training on identifying abuse, neglect, and illegal, unprofessional, and unethical conduct in certain health care facilities.
Title
Relating to inservice training on identifying abuse, neglect, and illegal, unprofessional, and unethical conduct in certain health care facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1205 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-06 | House | Record vote RV#1205 |
2023-05-06 | House | Passed |
2023-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-03-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING