TX HB2387 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-07 - Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
Pending: Senate Fiscal Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-07 - Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
Pending: Senate Fiscal Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the ad valorem taxation of certain tangible personal property located inside a defense base development authority.
Title
Relating to the ad valorem taxation of certain tangible personal property located inside a defense base development authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-19 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-19 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-19 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-19 | House | Passed |
2013-04-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-18 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-28 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2013-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Transportation
Transportation--Aviation
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Transportation
Transportation--Aviation