TX HB2435 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to rate adjustments by gas utilities.
Title
Relating to rate adjustments by gas utilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Postponed | |
2011-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-09 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-04 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-04 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-03 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-29 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-29 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-29 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2011-04-29 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-27 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | |
2011-04-27 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-27 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-23 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Energy Resources | |
2011-03-14 | Read first time | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |