TX HB2435 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public improvement projects financed by or through assessments levied on property by municipalities and counties.
Title
Relating to public improvement projects financed by or through assessments levied on property by municipalities and counties.
Sponsors
Rep. John Wray [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#788 (Y: 129 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Amended RV#703 (Y: 126 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Amended RV#703 (Y: 126 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2017-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BONDS
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
RECREATIONAL & CULTURAL FACILITIES
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
RECREATIONAL & CULTURAL FACILITIES
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous