TX HB2454 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to continuing education requirements for certain health professionals regarding pain management and the prescribing of opioids.
Title
Relating to continuing education requirements for certain health professionals regarding pain management and the prescribing of opioids.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#914 (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#914 (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#914 |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CONTINUING EDUCATION
DENTAL EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF
DENTISTS & DENTISTRY
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
NURSING, TEXAS BOARD OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANT BOARD, TEXAS
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS
PHYSICIANS
DENTAL EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF
DENTISTS & DENTISTRY
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
NURSING, TEXAS BOARD OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANT BOARD, TEXAS
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS
PHYSICIANS