TX HB2586 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to political contributions and political expenditures made to or by political committees or other persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to political contributions and political expenditures made to or by political committees or other persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1732 (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1062 (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1732
2019-05-23HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-20HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-20HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-20HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenatePassed
2019-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-19SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-19SenateAmended
2019-05-19SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Paxton
2019-05-19SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-15SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-13SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Administration
2019-05-10SenateRereferred to committee
2019-05-08SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-08SenateRead first time
2019-05-07SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1062
2019-05-07HousePassed
2019-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-06HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Elections
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1980 (Same As) 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2586
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02586I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02586H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02586E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02586S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02586F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2586&RcdVtNo=1062&Ch=H&Dt=05/07/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-19-F.PDF#page=15
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-19-F.PDF#page=16
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2586&RcdVtNo=1732&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2019

Bill Comments

feedback