TX HB2603 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to increasing the criminal penalty for the offense of trafficking of persons if committed at certain locations.
Title
Relating to increasing the criminal penalty for the offense of trafficking of persons if committed at certain locations.
Sponsors
Rep. Lacey Hull [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-21 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Day Care
Family
Family--Child Protection
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Day Care
Family
Family--Child Protection
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against