TX HB2641 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the release of a reversionary interest in certain real property by the Health and Human Services Commission and conditions related to that release.
Title
Relating to the release of a reversionary interest in certain real property by the Health and Human Services Commission and conditions related to that release.
Sponsors
Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Sen. Kel Seliger [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#320 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#320 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Effective immediately | |
2019-05-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-06 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-06 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-05 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-03 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-12 | House | Record vote RV#320 |
2019-04-12 | House | Passed |
2019-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-12 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-03 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1226 (Same As) 2019-04-09 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources