TX HB2838 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-17 - Referred to County Affairs
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-17 - Referred to County Affairs
Summary
Relating to the regulation of massage parlors by certain counties; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to the regulation of massage parlors by certain counties; providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-17 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1980 (Same As) 2009-03-24 - Referred to Criminal Justice
HB3094 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
HB3094 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
MASSAGE THERAPY & MASSAGE THERAPISTS
County Government--General
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
MASSAGE THERAPY & MASSAGE THERAPISTS