TX HB2955 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-14 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-14 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to liability of judges and magistrates for the improper release on personal bond of defendants accused of committing certain felony offenses.
Title
Relating to liability of judges and magistrates for the improper release on personal bond of defendants accused of committing certain felony offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB2117 (Same As) 2023-05-03 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
HB2117 (Same As) 2023-05-03 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
SB1971 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Referred to Criminal Justice
HB2117 (Same As) 2023-05-03 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
SB1971 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Courts
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
MAGISTRATES
Courts
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
MAGISTRATES
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB2955 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB02955I.htm |