TX HB301 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of English as the official language of Texas and the requirement that official acts of government be performed in English.
Title
Relating to the establishment of English as the official language of Texas and the requirement that official acts of government be performed in English.
Sponsors
Rep. Leo Berman [R] | Rep. Jim Jackson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-06 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-28 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-13 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-02-15 | Read first time | |
2010-11-16 | Filed |
Subjects
ENGLISH LANGUAGE
Human Relations
Legislature
Political Subdivisions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Human Relations
Legislature
Political Subdivisions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions