TX HB3055 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study of costs associated with dual credit courses offered at public high schools.
Title
Relating to a study of costs associated with dual credit courses offered at public high schools.
Sponsors
Rep. John Frullo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB863 (Same As) 2019-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Tuition
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Tuition
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3055 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03055I.htm |