TX HB31 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-16 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
Pending: Senate Transportation & Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-16 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
Pending: Senate Transportation & Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the period of license suspension after moving violations for a holder of a provisional driver's license.
Title
Relating to the period of license suspension after moving violations for a holder of a provisional driver's license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-05-16 | Read first time | |
2011-05-16 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-15 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-13 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-13 | Record vote | |
2011-05-13 | Passed as amended | |
2011-05-13 | Amended | |
2011-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-12 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-12 | Record vote | |
2011-05-12 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-12 | Point of order overruled | |
2011-05-12 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2011-05-12 | Amendment amended | |
2011-05-12 | Point of order withdrawn | |
2011-05-12 | Amendment to amendment offered | |
2011-05-12 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-12 | Record vote | |
2011-05-12 | Amendment to amendment fails of adoption | |
2011-05-12 | Point of order overruled | |
2011-05-12 | Amendment to amendment offered | |
2011-05-12 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-05-12 | Postponed | |
2011-05-12 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) | |
2011-05-12 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-09 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-02 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-29 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-29 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-18 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-18 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-18 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-04 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2011-04-04 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2011-04-04 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | |
2011-04-04 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2011-04-04 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | |
2011-03-31 | Subcommittee meeting cancelled | |
2011-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | |
2011-03-25 | Subcommittee members named | |
2011-03-25 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | |
2011-02-09 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed |