TX HB3103 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Referred to Economic Development
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Referred to Economic Development
Summary
Relating to a change in ownership of entities awarded grants from the Texas Enterprise Fund.
Title
Relating to a change in ownership of entities awarded grants from the Texas Enterprise Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Referred to Economic Development | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-29 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-28 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-28 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-28 | Record vote | |
2009-04-28 | Passed | |
2009-04-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-27 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-17 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-16 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Technology, Economic Development & Workforce | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
TEXAS ENTERPRISE FUND
Business & Commerce--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
TEXAS ENTERPRISE FUND