TX HB3127 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-21 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-21 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the study of school district property values conducted by the comptroller of public accounts.
Title
Relating to the study of school district property values conducted by the comptroller of public accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1342 (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1342 |
2023-05-09 | House | Passed |
2023-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-28 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2023-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-State Administration
Taxation--School District
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-State Administration
Taxation--School District