TX HB313 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to electronic voter registration.
Title
Relating to electronic voter registration.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Strama [D] | Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] | Rep. Patricia Harless [R] | Rep. Geanie Morrison [R] |
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Lon Burnam [D] | Rep. Mary Perez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Elections |
2013-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2012-12-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Elections
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SECRETARY OF STATE
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SECRETARY OF STATE